Dotson v. United States of America

Petitioner: Marcus Dotson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02128
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #5 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/26/2019. Respondent shall have until April 25, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint by United States of America. (Hartridge, Karen)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/25/2019. The United States shall file a response to the 2255 Motion within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of entry of this order. (Mays, Samuel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E. Hartridge on behalf of United States of America (Hartridge, Karen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence filed by Marcus Dotson against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Karen E. Hartridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?