Luke v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jeffrey R. Luke
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02146
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint in Opposition by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 "Attachment A-Randolph Alden Affidavit", #2 "Attachment B-Claiborne Ferguson Affidavit")(Bedini, Naya)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 04/30/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeffrey R. Luke. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Atttorney's Notice of Appearance, #2 Envelope)(jld)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 2255 Motion. Response due by 5/2/2019. Reply due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 04/03/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Ireland, Debra)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Lynn Ireland on behalf of United States of America (Ireland, Debra)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Government to respond to #1 2255 Motion. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 03/07/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 To Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody against United States of America, filed by Jeffrey R. Luke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial assignment cards)(jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luke v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey R. Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Debra Lynn Ireland
Represented By: Naya Bedini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?