Barnhart Crane & Rigging Co. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321

Plaintiff: Barnhart Crane & Rigging Co.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321
Not Yet Classified: Clerk and Master Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2019cv02289
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Mast on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321 (Mast, Gregory)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321.(Gureasko, Zachary)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY: NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Deadline. For good cause shown, Defendants' motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall have an extension of time up to and including May 23, 2019, by which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 5/9/19. (Norris, Mark)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321. (Gureasko, Zachary)
May 7, 2019 Civil Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3059850. (Gureasko, Zachary)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Correction to #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet. (Gureasko, Zachary)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321 has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The civil filing fee was not paid when prompted. Please use the event found under "Other Documents- Pay Civil Filing Fee". Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321 has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Civil cover sheet is blank. Please complete and resubmit as "Notice of Correction" and link the completed form to docket entry #1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321 from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-19-0522-2, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, with attached Exhibit A, a copy of Policy No. MACCD1502321, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Jef Feibelman, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal to the Shelby County Chancery Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gureasko, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhart Crane & Rigging Co. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnhart Crane & Rigging Co.
Represented By: Jef Feibelman
Represented By: Gary Scott Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. MACCD1502321
Represented By: Zachary Louis Gureasko
Represented By: Gregory Lee Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk and Master Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?