George v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Plaintiff: Steve George
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02296
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/2/2019. (Pham, Tu)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3104747) by Steve George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert.of Good Standing - Western Distr. of OK, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing - OK Supreme Court)(France, Tanner)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT OK Supreme Court Cert. of Good Standing to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3093324) by Steve George.. (Glass, Woodrow)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3093324) filed by Steve George has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rule 83.4 states a requirement of two certificates of good standing. A certificate from the bar association will not substitute for a certificate from the Supreme Court. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3093324) by Steve George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Glass, Woodrow)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Chapski, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Schaffler Quinn on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Quinn, Patrick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Chapski, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Chapski on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Chapski, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve George as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Cannon, William)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3061567), filed by Steve George. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cannon, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Represented By: Patrick Schaffler Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve George
Represented By: William Joshua Cannon
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Tanner France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?