United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Schuman et al

Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Lloyd Schuman and Dane Janes
Case Number: 2:2019cv02297
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/15/2019. (shl)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 AGREED MOTION FOR THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS LLOYD SCHUMAN AND DANE JANES. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/15/2019. (shl)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Parker on behalf of Lloyd Schuman (Parker, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/10/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment ; Proposed Order Submitted by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment As To Schuman, #2 Proposed Final Judgment As To Janes, #3 Exhibit Schuman Consent, #4 Exhibit Janes Consent, #5 Certificate of Consultation)(Scarlato, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Bar Certificate, #2 Exhibit DC Bar Certificate)(Scarlato, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dane Janes. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lloyd Schuman. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dane Janes, Lloyd Schuman, filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Lloyd Schuman, #3 Summons for Dane Janes)(Scarlato, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Schuman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Schuman
Represented By: Stephen C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Janes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Matthew Scarlato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?