Hodge v. Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Dana Hodge
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Not Yet Classified: Linda Summar
Case Number: 2:2019cv02303
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Dana Hodge Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosures (Lambert, Mark)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. Service of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Frulla, William)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 06/11/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 10/23/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2019. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/7/2019. Motions due by 11/30/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 06/11/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2019. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. The Court accepts the proposed scheduling order & will enter an order on Mediation, orders to be entered. Case set Friday, 11/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. for Status Conference. (Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Lambert)(Defense: William Christopher Frulla) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures and Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiff Dana Hodge (Frulla, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Frulla, William)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Dana Hodge by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P..(Frulla, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P... (Frulla, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P..(Frulla, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. from Lauderdale County Circuit Court, case number 7088 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3064384), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Frulla, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Represented By: William Christopher Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Hodge
Represented By: Mark Anthony Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Linda Summar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?