Woods v. Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Randy Woods and Rodney Woods
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc., DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC; John Doe Store Manager; and John Does 2-5, John Doe Store Manager, John Does 2-5 and DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02308
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Rodney Woods Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Collins, Jennifer)
July 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC.(Blackburn, Christen)
July 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC. (Blackburn, Christen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christen Blackburn on behalf of DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC (Blackburn, Christen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set on Monday, 07/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc..(Moore, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Moore, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-1878-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3067221), filed by Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Woods
Represented By: Jennifer Hinds Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Moore, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC; John Doe Store Manager; and John Does 2-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Store Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 2-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCTN3 329 Covington Memphis TN, LLC
Represented By: Christen Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?