Harper v. Rios, et al
Plaintiff: Amber Harper
Defendant: Erives Enterprises, Inc. and Raymundo Rios
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02309
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Anthony Lambert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lambert, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set on Monday, 07/15/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Erives Enterprises, Inc., Raymundo Rios of Filing Additional State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tarpley, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Erives Enterprises, Inc., Raymundo Rios.(Tarpley, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Erives Enterprises, Inc., Raymundo Rios.(Tarpley, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Raymundo Rios, Erives Enterprises, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note "wet signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signatures. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Erives Enterprises, Inc., Raymundo Rios. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit B. (Tarpley, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Erives Enterprises, Inc., Raymundo Rios from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-1553-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3067281), filed by Erives Enterprises, Inc., Raymundo Rios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Tarpley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Rios, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Harper
Represented By: John M. Bailey
Represented By: Mark Anthony Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erives Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymundo Rios
Represented By: John R. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?