United States of America v. Team Risk Management Strategic, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Yolanda McGill
Garnishee: Team Risk Management Strategic
Case Number: 2:2019cv02310
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF GARNISHMENT, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/05/2019. (Mays, Samuel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Writ of Garnishment Proof of Service upon Yolanda McGill (Zoccola, Barbara)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Writ of Garnishment Served upon Garnishee (Zoccola, Barbara)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (jld)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (PLEASE ISSUE), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zoccola, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Team Risk Management Strategic, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Team Risk Management Strategic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara M. Zoccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?