Caradine v. MB Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth L Caradine
Defendant: MB Trucking, LLC and Rajab Issa Ndikumako
Not Yet Classified: Clerk and Master Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02322
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kenneth L Caradine (Chen, Lan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kenneth L Caradine (Chen, Lan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MB Trucking, LLC.(Wyatt, Carl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MB Trucking, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MB Trucking, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1757-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3071348), filed by MB Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caradine v. MB Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajab Issa Ndikumako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk and Master Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Caradine
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Robert Louis Gatewood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?