Allgood v. Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Allgood
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. and Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02323
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Irons, Pamela)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER [Text Only - No Image Attached] Granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/3/2019. (Pham, Tu)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed)(proposed order submitted) by All Defendants. (Prather, Paul)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela R. Irons on behalf of Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation, Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. (Irons, Pamela)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Prather on behalf of All Defendants (Prather, Paul)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER - [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] - Granting DE #13 Defendants' Motion for Extension until 7/2/19 to file an Answer/Response signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/6/19. (Fowlkes, John)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting DE #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/5/19. (Fowlkes, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Allgood as to Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.. (Lakey, Jonathan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Allgood as to Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation. (Lakey, Jonathan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint [Proposed] Order Submitted by Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation, Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.. (Mehdian, Sheerin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheerin Mehdian on behalf of Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation, Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. (Mehdian, Sheerin)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Correction to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3074221) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Robinson, Lance)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3074221) filed by Margaret Allgood has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rule 83.4 (A) states that a certificate of good standing from the highest Court of a state or the District of Columbia and from a United States District Court. These two certificates should be entered when filing a Pro Hac Vice.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3074221) by Margaret Allgood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Robinson, Lance)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons by Jonathan P. Lakey on behalf of Margaret Allgood. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lakey, Jonathan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3072383), filed by Margaret Allgood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Lakey, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allgood v. Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela R. Irons
Represented By: Sheerin Mehdian
Represented By: Paul E. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation
Represented By: Pamela R. Irons
Represented By: Sheerin Mehdian
Represented By: Paul E. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Allgood
Represented By: Jonathan P. Lakey
Represented By: Lance Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?