Jefferson v. Durham School Services, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Calvin E Jefferson
Defendant: Durham School Services, L.P. and Ebony Latris Levelston
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02329
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Durham School Services, L.P., Ebony Latris Levelston of Service (Discovery Responses) (Houseal, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mathis, Andre)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Calvin E Jefferson (Chen, Lan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 7/25/2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcnCounsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (Fowlkes, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Mathis, Andre)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John I. Houseal, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Houseal, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Durham School Services, L.P., Ebony Latris Levelston has been filed. For future reference, please note Civil cover sheet does not have electronic signature of filer.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1769-19; Div IX (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3073941), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 = Copies of Summons and Complaint from State Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 = Copies of all Pleadings Filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 = Defendants' Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Mathis, Andre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Durham School Services, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham School Services, L.P.
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: John I. Houseal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Latris Levelston
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: John I. Houseal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin E Jefferson
Represented By: Lan Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?