Rosales v. My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gelacio Alejandre Rosales
Defendant: My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02335
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager.(pyb) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/2/2019) (Fowlkes, John).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc..(Meyers, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gelacio Alejandre Rosales as to My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc.. (Ashby, Bryce)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Crandall Osowski on behalf of Gelacio Alejandre Rosales (Osowski, Janelle)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Ryan on behalf of Gelacio Alejandre Rosales (Ryan, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under the FLSA against My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3077267), filed by Gelacio Alejandre Rosales. (Attachments: #1 *Civil Cover Sheet* Certificate of Consultation, #2 Summons for My Town)(Ashby, Bryce) * Modified on 5/29/2019 (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Town Maintenance, Roofing & Renovation, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gelacio Alejandre Rosales
Represented By: Janelle Crandall Osowski
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?