Oglesby et al v. Erie Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Richard Oglesby and Deirdre Oglesby
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02361
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR T. JOSEPH SNODGRASS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 7/11/2019. (CLAXTON, CHARMIANE)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3109714) by Deirdre Oglesby, Richard Oglesby. (Attachments: #1 Admissions, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (MN Supreme Court), #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (USDC MN))(Snodgrass, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deirdre Oglesby, Richard Oglesby. Erie Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (McWherter, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deirdre Oglesby, Richard Oglesby as to Erie Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(McWherter, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Bobbitt on behalf of Deirdre Oglesby, Richard Oglesby (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily S. Alcorn on behalf of Deirdre Oglesby, Richard Oglesby (Alcorn, Emily)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Erie Insurance Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against Erie Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3083098), filed by Deirdre Oglesby, Richard Oglesby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McWherter, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oglesby et al v. Erie Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Oglesby
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre Oglesby
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?