United States of America v. $368,816.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $368,816.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: XPO Logistics, Darnise Johnson and Marc E Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02363
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis P. Britt, III on behalf of XPO Logistics (Britt, Louis)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by XPO Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Verified Claim)(Britt, Louis)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER & FORFEITURE ON REM. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 06/26/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Verified Claim by Marc E Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Verified Claim)(Leffler, Stephen)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Darnise Johnson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to XPO Logistics. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marc E Johnson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to F.B.I.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America Four (4) Summons to be issued (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Cotten, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Warant Issued and given to USM. (wrh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE against $368,816.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $368,816.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: XPO Logistics
Represented By: Louis P. Britt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darnise Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marc E Johnson
Represented By: Stephen R. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $368,816.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?