Brunson v. Lasalle Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Tythia Brunson
Defendant: Lasalle Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, U.S. Bank National Association and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2019cv02369
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Tythia Brunson Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosure (Lenow, Edwin)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Clerk of Court to adjust docket sheet in conformity with this Order. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/9/19. (des)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Lasalle Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC Notice of Authority (Morris, Samuel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Non-Jury Trial is set for Tuesday, 8/4/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Telephonic Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 7/24/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. ***Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291.*** Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 7/17/2020. (jrs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2019. Edwin C. Lenow appeared for the Plaintiff. Reid S. Manley appeared for the Defendant. Amended pleadings will be filed to correct parties. Case style will be corrected via Clerk's office. Non-Jury Trial is set for Tuesday, 8/4/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 1-2 days. Telephonic Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 7/24/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 7/17/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Aitken Morris on behalf of Lasalle Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Morris, Samuel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lasalle Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bank National Assocation for Lasalle Bank National Association; Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.. (Manley, Reid)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Lasalle Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.(Manley, Reid)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 7/8/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lasalle Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Manley, Reid)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CH-19-0781 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3085244), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Manley, Reid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunson v. Lasalle Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tythia Brunson
Represented By: Edwin C. Lenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasalle Bank National Association
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?