Gomez v. Brommer
Plaintiff: Inocencio Gomez
Defendant: John D. Brommer
Case Number: 2:2019cv02370
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/22/19. (des)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement and ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/22/19. (des)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Approval of FLSA Settlement (proposed order submitted) by Inocencio Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement)(Ashby, Bryce)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 7/29/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl I. Jacobson on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobson, Carl)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inocencio Gomez as to John D. Brommer. (Ashby, Bryce)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to John D. Brommer. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Crandall Osowski on behalf of Inocencio Gomez (Osowski, Janelle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Ryan on behalf of Inocencio Gomez (Ryan, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under the FLSA against John D. Brommer (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3085565), filed by Inocencio Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for John D. Brommer)(Ashby, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Brommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inocencio Gomez
Represented By: Janelle Crandall Osowski
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Brommer
Represented By: Carl I. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?