Mitchell v. Kone Inc.

Plaintiff: Sheri Mitchell
Defendant: Kone Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02377
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Kone Inc. of Service of Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures (O'Brien, Garrett)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Sheri Mitchell of Service of Initial Disclosures (Martin, Bobby)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/22/2020. (jrs)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/3/2019. Bobby F. Martin, Jr. appeared for the Plaintiff. Garrett Hunter O'Brien appeared for the Defendant. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/22/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Cathy Best) (jrs)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/3/2019. (jjf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed) Scheduling Order)(O'Brien, Garrett)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 7/3/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Kone Inc. of Intent to Rebut Presumption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Intent to Rebut Presumption)(O'Brien, Garrett)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kone Inc..(O'Brien, Garrett)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kone Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1854-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3087765), filed by Kone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Kone Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Mitchell
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kone Inc.
Represented By: Garrett Hunter O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?