Stewart v. Transhorn Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Robert Stewart
Defendant: XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc., Tewolde Mirutse, Transhorn Trucking, LLC, XTRA, LLC and XTRA
Not Yet Classified: Clerk and Master Virginia Gray
Case Number: 2:2019cv02389
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Transhorn Trucking, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (King, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Tewolde Mirutse of Service of Initial Disclosures (King, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by XTRA, LLC Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures by XTRA LLC (Fargotstein, Samuel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Robert Stewart Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Jordan, Russell)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) Modified on 8/6/2019 (Parker, Thomas).
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Scheduling Conference held on 7/31/2019. Russell Jordan and William Hackett appeared for the Government. Rebecca Hinds appeared for Defendants. The Court set scheduling dates. Pretrial Order due by 7/31/20. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/20 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Criminal Jury Trial set for 8/24/20 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Cathy Best) (mlk)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 7/31/19. (jgb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca K. Hinds on behalf of XTRA, LLC (Hinds, Rebecca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). (Fargotstein, Samuel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Hackett on behalf of Robert Stewart (Hackett, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transhorn Trucking, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transhorn Trucking, LLC for Transhorn Trucking, LLC.. (King, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transhorn Trucking, LLC.(King, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tewolde Mirutse.(King, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent XTRA Companies, Inc. for XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc... (Fargotstein, Samuel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc..(Fargotstein, Samuel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc. from Circuit Court of Tipton County, Tennessee, case number 7642 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3093759), filed by XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fargotstein, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Transhorn Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stewart
Represented By: Russell B. Jordan
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTRA, LLC a/k/a XTRA, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Meeker Fargotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tewolde Mirutse
Represented By: James S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transhorn Trucking, LLC
Represented By: James S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTRA, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Meeker Fargotstein
Represented By: Rebecca K. Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTRA
Represented By: Samuel Meeker Fargotstein
Represented By: Rebecca K. Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk and Master Virginia Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?