Harris v. Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Wendell Harris
Defendant: MC Consulting, LLC and Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02397
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Shaeffer on behalf of All Defendants (Shaeffer, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMAR MALIK AS COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 8/12/2019. (ars)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Malik on behalf of Wendell Harris (Malik, Omar)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by MC Consulting, LLC, Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC First and Second Sets of Interrogatories and Request for Production to the Plaintiff (Carroll, Hunter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Wendell Harris Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Discovery Requests for Defendants (Malik, Omar)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: DE #16 MOTION for Discovery Regarding Arbitration filed by Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MC Consulting, LLC, DE #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Case filed by Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MC Consulting, LLC signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (Fowlkes, John).
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for 2/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 07/11/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 1/15/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 07/11/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. The Court will enter an order referring de#11 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Case & de#16 Motion for Discovery Regarding Arbitration to the Magistrate Judge, Order to be entered. The Court will adjust the dates in the proposed scheduling order & sets a Mediation deadline of Wednesday, January 15, 2020, orders to be entered. Case set Friday, 02/07/2020 at 9:00 a.m. for Status Conference. (Plaintiff: Omar Z. Malik)(Defense: David Mark Eaton) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Discovery Regarding Arbitration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Carroll, Hunter)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Correction to 14 Deficiency Notice,, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, and C)(Malik, Omar)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Wendell Harris has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: "Wet Signature". See ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Effectiveness of Electronic Signature. Failure to Provide electronic signature will render the filing deficient. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Case Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Malik, Omar)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Case filed by All Defendants. (Carroll, Hunter)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Case by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Carroll, Hunter)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MC Consulting, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note Wet signature is on the civil cover sheet. Please see LR 11.1 concerning electronic signatures. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MC Consulting, LLC, Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC. (Eaton, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by MC Consulting, LLC.(Eaton, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC.(Eaton, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number 2313-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3095610), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B -Redacted Bills, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Record)(Eaton, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC Consulting, LLC
Represented By: David Mark Eaton
Represented By: Hunter Carroll
Represented By: Christopher L. Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midtown Center for Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: David Mark Eaton
Represented By: Hunter Carroll
Represented By: Christopher L. Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Harris
Represented By: Omar Z Malik
Represented By: Omar Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?