Herbert v. Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: David A. Herbert
Defendant: Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02405
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Comden on behalf of Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc. (Comden, Anthony)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Edsenga on behalf of Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin David Bernstein on behalf of David A. Herbert (Bernstein, Kevin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Margello, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Herbert Charge of Discrimination)(Margello, Nicholas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Seger Renfroe on behalf of David A. Herbert (Renfroe, Jared)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3098835), filed by David A. Herbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Summons Meritage Hospitality Group, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert v. Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Frank Margello
Represented By: Patrick M. Edsenga
Represented By: Anthony R. Comden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Herbert
Represented By: Jared Seger Renfroe
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Represented By: Kevin David Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?