Gomez v. City of Memphis, Tennessee et al
Defendant: Officer Vincent Macaraeg, City of Memphis, Tennessee, John Doe 1-15, Shelby County, Tennessee, Officer A Henderson, Lieutenant Roosevelt Twilley and Officer Jose Flores
Estate Plaintiff: Amy D Gomez
Case Number: 2:2019cv02412
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Guy, Sean)
August 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Florence M. Johnson on behalf of City of Memphis, Tennessee (Johnson, Florence)
August 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay M. Roberts on behalf of Jose Flores, A Henderson, Vincent Macaraeg, Roosevelt Twilley (Roberts, Barclay)
August 6, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbaralette G. Davis on behalf of City of Memphis, Tennessee (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Davis, Barbaralette)
August 6, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roosevelt Twilley.(McKinney, Mary)
August 6, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A Henderson.(Godwin, Deborah)
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vincent Macaraeg.(McKinney, Mary)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jose Flores.(McKinney, Mary)
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy H. Chockley, Jr on behalf of Shelby County, Tennessee (Chockley, Roy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 8/28/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shelby County answer due 8/27/2019. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/31/19. (des) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY ~ NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED**]
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Shelby County's Combined Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Pleadings (proposed order submitted) by Shelby County, Tennessee. (Whitwell, Emmett)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmett Lee Whitwell on behalf of Shelby County, Tennessee (Whitwell, Emmett)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy D Gomez as to Vincent Macaraeg. (Guy, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy D Gomez as to A Henderson. (Guy, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy D Gomez as to Jose Flores. (Guy, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy D Gomez as to Roosevelt Twilley. (Guy, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy D Gomez as to Shelby County, Tennessee. (Guy, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy D Gomez as to City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Guy, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to City of Memphis, Tennessee, Jose Flores, A Henderson, Vincent Macaraeg, Shelby County, Tennessee, Roosevelt Twilley. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Shelby County Tennessee, #2 Officer Twilley, #3 Officer Flores, #4 Officer Henderson, #5 Officer Macaraeg)(jae)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Summons by Sean Roberts Guy on behalf of Amy D Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Guy, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 Notice of Summons filed by Amy D Gomez has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Each summons must contain the second page, and must be submitted separately. You can publish the first one, then the remainder of the summons can be published as attachments to the first one. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons by Sean Roberts Guy on behalf of Amy D Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" (Summonses))(Guy, Sean)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. *TEXT ORDER ONLY*. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/3/2019. (jjf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Roberts Guy on behalf of Amy D Gomez (Guy, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Correction to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order emailed to chambers) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3101454) Certificate of Good Standing. (Guy, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order emailed to chambers) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3101454) has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rule 83.4 states a requirement of TWO certificates of good standing. Filer has submitted only one certificate. Filer will also have to now enter a notice of appearance since name and contact information was not entered when the motion was published. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order emailed to chambers) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3101454) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Guy, Sean)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Amy D Gomez has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet Signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3100616), filed by Amy D Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bonner, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. City of Memphis, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vincent Macaraeg
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McKinney
Represented By: Barclay M. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis, Tennessee
Represented By: Florence M. Johnson
Represented By: Barbaralette G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County, Tennessee
Represented By: Emmett Lee Whitwell
Represented By: Roy H. Chockley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer A Henderson
Represented By: Barclay M. Roberts
Represented By: Deborah E. Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Roosevelt Twilley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McKinney
Represented By: Barclay M. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jose Flores
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McKinney
Represented By: Barclay M. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Amy D Gomez
Represented By: Zachary M. Bonner
Represented By: Sean Roberts Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?