Gbor v. Owens

Petitioner: Jeffery Dulwonh Gbor
Respondent: Warden Owens and Warden Angela Owens
Case Number: 2:2019cv02413
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO RESPOND TO PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/2/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Jeffery D. Gbor requesting information that fee paid. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (jae)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 5.00, receipt number M4676042761 (csf)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 6/26/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Jeffery Dulwonh Gbor against Owens. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Support, #2 Attachments, #3 Envelope (Front and Back), #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gbor v. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffery Dulwonh Gbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Owens
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Angela Owens
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?