Williams v. H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Defendant: H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02428
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION as to Mediator by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.. (Broy, Joseph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc..(Broy, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Bryan Williams of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Spence, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc. Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures (Broy, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent B.H. Shoe Holdings, Inc. for H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc... (Broy, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, September 21, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Order due by September 4, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, September 11, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 8/14/2019. Robert L. J. Spence Jr. appeared for the plaintiff. Joseph L. Broy appeared for the defendant. Jury Trial set for Monday, September 21, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 3 days. Pretrial Order due by September 4, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, SeptemBer 11, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (Court Reporter: LaShawn Marshall Alpha Court Reporting) (smm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Murrell, Jerrick)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, August 14, 2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. #9 Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/31/19. (shl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.. (Broy, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc..(Broy, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 8/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (jpw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet Signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1770-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3107719), filed by H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Broy, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.H. Brown Shoe Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Broy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Represented By: Jerrick D. Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?