Jefferson v.Hall
Petitioner: Jerald Jefferson
Respondent: State of Tennessee and Warden Hilton Hall, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02430
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Hilton Hall, Jr. Answer due 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/29/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Hilton Hall, Jr. (Douglas, Richard)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD AND TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/2/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of State of Tennessee (Douglas, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/10/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerald Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Fund Certificate and Statement)(csf)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jerald Jefferson against State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v.Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerald Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Hilton Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?