American Service Insurance Company v. Allstar Transport Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Service Insurance Company
Defendant: Allstar Transport Services, LLC, Josett Holiday and Lekendra Gray
Case Number: 2:2019cv02436
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 08/27/2019. (shl)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 08/27/2019. (shl)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Service Insurance Company as to Josett Holiday. (Box, Bradford)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Service Insurance Company as to Allstar Transport Services, LLC. (Box, Bradford)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Box, Bradford)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Josett Holiday. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lekendra Gray. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Allstar Transport Services, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Allstar Transport Services, LLC, Lekendra Gray, Josett Holiday (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3109620), filed by American Service Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Cancellation, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Summons Allstar, #5 Summons Gray, #6 Summons Holiday, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Box, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Service Insurance Company v. Allstar Transport Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Transport Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josett Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lekendra Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Service Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradford David Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?