Reed v. WI Memphis, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tytiana M. Reed
Defendant: WI Memphis, LLC, Summit Asset Management, LLC, Southern Oaks Place, Gideon Zook and Southern Oaks Apartments
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02440
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WI Memphis, LLC. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by WI Memphis, LLC, Gideon Zook.(Van Namen, Kathryn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K. Van Namen on behalf of Gideon Zook (Van Namen, Kathryn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K. Van Namen on behalf of WI Memphis, LLC (Van Namen, Kathryn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by WI Memphis, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Perry, Gadson)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by WI Memphis, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The civil cover sheet is missing. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WI Memphis, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-2409-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3111098), filed by WI Memphis, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Filing from Shelby County Circuit Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of J. Michael Murphy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Garry Pope, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of David Zook)(Perry, Gadson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. WI Memphis, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WI Memphis, LLC
Represented By: Gadson William Perry
Represented By: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Oaks Place
Represented By: Gadson William Perry
Represented By: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gideon Zook
Represented By: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Oaks Apartments
Represented By: Gadson William Perry
Represented By: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tytiana M. Reed
Represented By: David A. Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?