Ealy v. Source Investment Group, Inc. d/b/a Candyland Gentlemen's Club et al
Plaintiff: Tomeisha Ealy
Defendant: Laurence Carpenter and Source Investment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02442
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Carter Walsh on behalf of Tomeisha Ealy (Walsh, Catherine)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan G. Crone on behalf of Tomeisha Ealy (Crone, Alan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, September 19, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm . Modified to correct the date on 8/15/2019 (smm).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD #14 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/14/2019. (shl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certifiacte of Consultation)(Perryman, J.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Vincent Perryman on behalf of All Defendants (Perryman, J.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. {**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/8/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Good Standing for Gregg C. Greenberg from the United States District Court for the District of Maryland and the State of Maryland by Tomeisha Ealy. (Greenberg, Gregg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3134627) filed by Tomeisha Ealy has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: PHV motions must be accompanied by TWO current certificate of good standing. One from the highest court of the state in which attorney is licensed to practice and one from a District Court. Please publish these two certificates under the event "Attachment", linking the submission to DE #9 . Please refer to the ECF User Manual and ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency.(Lipman, Sheryl)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregg C. Greenberg (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3134627) by Tomeisha Ealy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenberg, Gregg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomeisha Ealy as to Laurence Carpenter. (Dorsey, Bailey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Laurence Carpenter. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Source Investment Group, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laurence Carpenter, Source Investment Group, Inc. d/b/a Candyland Gentlemen's Club (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3111778), filed by Tomeisha Ealy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Source Investment Group, Inc., #3 Summons Laurence Carpenter)(Dorsey, Bailey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ealy v. Source Investment Group, Inc. d/b/a Candyland Gentlemen's Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeisha Ealy
Represented By: Bailey H. Dorsey
Represented By: Gregg Greenberg
Represented By: Alan G. Crone
Represented By: Catherine Carter Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence Carpenter
Represented By: J. Vincent Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Source Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: J. Vincent Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?