Davis v. Crowell
Petitioner: Michael Davis
Respondent: Georgia Crowell
Case Number: 2:2019cv02448
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/6/2019. (kah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Georgia Crowell. (Watkins, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Directing Respondent to Respond to the Habeas Petition and the Motion to Stay Proceedings #3 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/12/2019. (pab)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 5.00, receipt number M4676042919 (csf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Austin Watkins on behalf of Georgia Crowell (Watkins, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Davis. (csf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Michael Davis. (csf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Davis. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Fund Affidavit and Statement)(csf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Davis against Georgia Crowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Partial Transcript, #2 Exhibit B Phone Log, #3 Exhibit C Conflict of Interest Evidence, #4 Exhibit D Partial Transcript, #5 Exhibit E Medical Information, #6 Exhibit F Page 74 Post-Conviction Page 474-482 Trial Transcript, #7 Exhibit G Affidavit, #8 Exhibit H Witness Interview, #9 Exhibit I Phone Record Testimony, #10 Exhibit K MPD Evidence Report, #11 Exhibit L Partial Transcript, #12 Exhibit M Trial Transcript, Pictures, Sketch and Report of M.P.D. C.S.I Officers, #13 Court Opinions, #14 Included Expenses, #15 Envelope, #16 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Georgia Crowell
Represented By: Thomas Austin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?