Ruzicka v. Haraway et al
Plaintiff: Bo James Ruzicka
Defendant: Coy N. Haraway and Redwing Technical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02482
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: A Patent Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 10/23/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The parties are directed to confer before the Patent Scheduling Conference pursuant to LPR 2.1(b) and submit a Joint Planning Report and Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to LPR 2.1(c). (jrs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Redwing Technical Systems, Inc..(Washington, W.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Coy N. Haraway.(Washington, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bo James Ruzicka as to Redwing Technical Systems, Inc.. (Cates, Taylor)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bo James Ruzicka as to Coy N. Haraway. (Cates, Taylor)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Redwing Technical Systems, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Coy N. Haraway. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #2 Complaint, filed by Bo James Ruzicka has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet Signature" on the civil cover sheet. See ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Complex track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bo James Ruzicka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Coy N. Haraway, #3 Summons for Redwing Technical Systems, Inc., #4 Exhibit A-Patent, Invention, and Consultant Agreement). Filing fee $400 paid, receipt ATNWDC-3126759 (Cates, Taylor). Filing fee info added on 7/30/2019 (cbs).
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,434,544 and 9,694,995. (Cates, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruzicka v. Haraway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bo James Ruzicka
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coy N. Haraway
Represented By: W. Clark Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwing Technical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: W. Clark Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?