Consolidated Staffing, Inc. v. Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Consolidated Staffing, Inc.
Defendant: Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc. and Jose Nunos Lopes
Case Number: 2:2019cv02483
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Futhey, Malcolm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and improper venue, or in the alternative, motion to transfer to the Central District of California, proposed order submitted, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jose Nuno Lopes)(Futhey, Malcolm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Brown Futhey, III on behalf of All Defendants (Futhey, Malcolm)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants will have until September 27, 2019, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/9/19. (bab)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, 14 Deficiency Notice,, Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Billings, Paul)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Stipulation filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Parties cannot stipulate to extend time set by FRCvP. Request for an extension of time must be granted or denied by the District Judge. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, First Extension of Time To Respond by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. as to Jose Nunos Lopes. (Billings, Paul)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. as to Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Billings, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jose Nunos Lopes. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons by Paul B. Billings, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons by Paul B. Billings, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5305244; CONSOLIDATED STAFFING (WORD TRADEMARK). (Billings, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK COUNTERFEITING, TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, TRADEMARK DILUTION, FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION, UNFAIR COMPETITION IN VIOLATION OF TN. CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT, COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3127095), filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Billings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Staffing, Inc. v. Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Brown Futhey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Nunos Lopes
Represented By: Malcolm Brown Futhey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Paul B. Billings, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?