Reaves Law Firm, PLLC v. Tiger Sports Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Reaves Law Firm, PLLC
Defendant: Tiger Sports Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02495
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/17/2019 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. PLEASE FOLLOW INSTRUCTIONS FOR SCHEDULING ON JUDGE FOWLKES' WEBSITE @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tiger Sports Properties, LLC. (Carter, Samuel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and, COUNTERCLAIM against Reaves Law Firm, PLLC by Tiger Sports Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Counterclaim)(Carter, Samuel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward L. Stanton, III on behalf of Tiger Sports Properties, LLC (Stanton, Edward)
August 11, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Damages served on Tiger Sports Properties, LLC on 8/6/2019, filed by Reaves Law Firm, PLLC. (Meredith, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Meredith on behalf of Reaves Law Firm, PLLC (Meredith, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Mark Horvath on behalf of Reaves Law Firm, PLLC (Horvath, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tiger Sports Properties, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/5/2019) (jld). (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/5/2019) (jld).
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Tiger Sports Properties, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3130566), filed by Reaves Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Tiger Sports Properties, LLC, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Spence, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves Law Firm, PLLC v. Tiger Sports Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Sports Properties, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Represented By: Edward L. Stanton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reaves Law Firm, PLLC
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Mark Horvath
Represented By: Bryan Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?