Tanner v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tanner
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02496
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION [Text Only - No Image Attached. Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 has been CANCELED. (tlh)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 09/23/2019. (jrs)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Elizabeth Tanner Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Laurenzi, Eugene)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Elizabeth Tanner of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Laurenzi, Eugene)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting extension for defendant's responses to plaintiff's first discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 09/11/2019. (jrs)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SETTING: The parties are hereby notified that a SCHEDULING CONFERENCE has been set for Wednesday, September 25, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. All parties, including pro se litigants, are expected to comply with Rules 16(b) and 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 16.2. At least three (3) business days prior to the Scheduling Conference, the parties shall email a proposed joint scheduling order to ECF_Judge_Pham@tnwd.uscourts.gov. The proposed joint scheduling order must be based on this court's form order, which can be found at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/JudgePham. (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (tlh)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AO 85 CONSENT to proceed before Magistrate Judge and ORDER OF REFERENCE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/06/2019. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham for all further proceedings. (Mays, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Judicial assignment card) (jae).
September 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham assigned as presiding judge per #14 . Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jae)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Minutes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 09/04/2019 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Eugene Laurenzi appeared for the pltf. Atty Lauren Deakins appeared for Kroger Limited Partnership I. Parties consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Consent Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Traci Walker) (jam)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I of Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Vescovo, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting proposed order submitted. (Vescovo, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Wednesday, 09/04/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Elizabeth Tanner Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories Propounded to Defndant (Laurenzi, Eugene)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I of Service of Defendant's First Set of Discovery Requests (Vescovo, Christopher)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kroger Limited Partnership I.(Vescovo, Christopher)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Elizabeth Tanner Service of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant (Laurenzi, Eugene)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Limited Partnership I from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-2753-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3130637), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Vescovo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Christopher L. Vescovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tanner
Represented By: Eugene A. Laurenzi
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?