Valenzuela v. Social Security Administration, et al
Plaintiff: Sophia Venlenzuela and Sofia E Galvan De Valenzuela
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Nancy A Berryhill, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, Commissioner of SSA Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv02539
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Social Security , U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney WDTN, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General William Barr) 8/22/2019 (jld). ). (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/22/2019) (jld). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2019) (jld). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/22/2019) (jld).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 8/22/2019. (Vescovo, Diane)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/15/2019. Plaintiff's application #2 to proceed d in forma pauperis is referred to the magistrate judge for a determination. (Mays, Samuel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 *********Please disregard NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): The ADR Plan does not apply to Social Security Cases****************** (jld) Modified on 8/15/2019 (jld).
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sophia Venlenzuela. (Dunlap, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sophia Venlenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dunlap, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valenzuela v. Social Security Administration, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Venlenzuela
Represented By: John Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia E Galvan De Valenzuela
Represented By: John Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?