Staples v. Owens
Petitioner: David L. Staples
Respondent: Angela M. Owens
Case Number: 2:2019cv02547
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 5.00, receipt number M4676043515 (csf)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se AMENDED PETITION against Angela M. Owens, filed by David L. Staples. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Judgment, #2 Exhibit B Misdemeanor Citation, #3 Affidavit David L. Stales, #4 Affidavit Pastor John Jones, #5 Amend #11, #6 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Funds, #7 Envelope) (jld)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN INFORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 9/23/2019. (jae)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by David L. Staples against Angela M. Owens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope (Front and Back), #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staples v. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela M. Owens
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David L. Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?