Santana v. United States
Defendant: United States and Warden Angela Owens
Petitioner: Francisco Santana
Case Number: 2:2019cv02548
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of returned certified receipt #9590 9402 3890 8060 2391 74 (jld)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of returned certified receipt #9590 9402 3890 8060 2391 98. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO MODIFY DOCKET AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO RESPOND TO PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/20/19. (Norris, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 5.00, receipt number M4676043287 (csf)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 5.00, receipt number M4676043245 (csf)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 8/20/19. (Norris, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Francisco Santana against United States. (Attachments: #1 Collective Attachment A, #2 Flat envelope, #3 Regular Envelope (sent to AUSA), #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Angela Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?