Alsbrook et al v. Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Collins, Darren Williams, Kendra Lloyd, Latanya Brownlee, Edward Evans, Michele Alsbrook, Kendra Warren, Buffy Cleven (Bell), Mercedes Treadway, Caleb Martin and Wendy Holley
Defendant: Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02583
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/23/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 9/20/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Irvine on behalf of Concorde Career Colleges, Inc. (Irvine, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas F. Halijan on behalf of Concorde Career Colleges, Inc. (Halijan, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Concorde Career Colleges, Inc. on 9/04/2019, filed by Michele Alsbrook, Latanya Brownlee, Buffy Cleven (Bell), Barbara Collins, Edward Evans, Wendy Holley, Kendra Lloyd, Caleb Martin, Mercedes Treadway, Kendra Warren, Darren Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit and Proof of Service)(Timmons, Brice)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Cochran, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cochran, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Mitchell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Charles)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Worrell Sterling on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sterling, Amy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3154331), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons issued to Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.)(Timmons, Brice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsbrook et al v. Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Collins
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Williams
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Lloyd
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Brownlee
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Evans
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Alsbrook
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Warren
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffy Cleven (Bell)
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Treadway
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Martin
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Holley
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Mitchell
Represented By: Amy Worrell Sterling
Represented By: Christopher Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concorde Career Colleges, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas F. Halijan
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?