Branstetter v. Holland America Line N.V. LLC
Plaintiff: Kelsie Branstetter
Defendant: Holland America Line N.V. LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02596
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 11/13/19) (jl)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kelsie Branstetter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - Direct Reservation Sales Agent Listing, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - Cruise Consultant Listing, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - B.B. King's Blues Club Articles, #5 Exhibit D to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - Band Auditions Posting, #6 Exhibit E to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - Informational Cruise Packet, #7 Exhibit F to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - Country Music Cruise Information, #8 Exhibit G to Affidavit of Kelsie Branstetter - Musician Audition Posting)(Coombs, Elissa)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION #19 for temporary exemption from Rule 26(a) and (f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/24/2019. (Mays, Samuel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Holland America Line N.V. LLC Motion for Temporary Exemption from Rule 26 (a) and (f)- Proposed Order Submitted (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #17 TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY at the November 13, 2019 Scheduling Conference, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/22/2019. (Mays, Samuel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically proposed order submitted by Holland America Line N.V. LLC. (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 11/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 11/15/19) (jl)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Holland America Line N.V. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Colwell)(Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Holland America Line N.V. LLC has been filed. Does not appear to be a motion. It is styled as Declaration of James Colwell.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Holland America Line N.V. LLC. (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set on Friday, 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon on behalf of Holland America Line N.V. LLC (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Holland America Line N.V. LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: "Wet Signature". Please see ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1 Electronic Signature, failure to provide that electronic signature will render the filing deficient. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. 9/24/2019 (jld).
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon on behalf of Holland America Line N.V. LLC (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelsie Branstetter as to Holland America Line N.V. LLC. (Coombs, Elissa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Holland America Line N.V. LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holland America Line N.V. LLC, filed by Kelsie Branstetter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Coombs, Elissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branstetter v. Holland America Line N.V. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsie Branstetter
Represented By: Elissa Mulrooney Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line N.V. LLC
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?