Sykes v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center et al
Plaintiff: Phalinda Sykes
Defendant: Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Donald T. Denz, Norbert A. Bennett, Aurora Cares, LLC, D&N, LLC and DTD HC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02602
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Phalinda Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Acerra, Carey)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. For good cause shown, the motion is hereby granted, and Plaintiff's responsive brief shall be up to twenty-five (25) pages. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 11/05/2019. (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (jrs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages proposed order submitted filed by Phalinda Sykes has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer is not required to publish a proposed order. Filer's should only indicate in the docket text "proposed order submitted", and email the proposed order to the presiding judge's chambers. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
November 4, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages proposed order submitted by Phalinda Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limit)(Arnold, Deena)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #26 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 2019-30, for the period from October 25, 2019 through November 6, 2019, all discovery matters in both civil and criminal cases, all requests for extension of time to file or respond, requests for leave to reply, all motions to continue, and any non-dispositive motion requiring determination before November 7, 2019 in cases assigned to United States District Judge Sheryl H. Lipman are referred to the Magistrate Judge to whom the case is assigned for determination. The undersigned hereby grants both Motions. Defendant Quince Nursing andRehabilitation Center, LLC may file a reply brief in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration within ten (10) days of this Order. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 10/29/2019. (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (jrs)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration (D.E. 17) (proposed order submitted) by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. (Siler, Brent)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Proposed Order Submitted) by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz. (Frye, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Phalinda Sykes of Service (Arnold, Deena)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Phalinda Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Phalinda Sykes, #2 Exhibit B - Medical Records)(Arnold, Deena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Scheduling Conference is reset from Wednesday, November 20, 2019 at 9:00 AM to Wednesday, December 4, 2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT QUINCE NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY #20 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/18/2019. (shl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay (proposed order submitted) by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. (Frye, William)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, November 20, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A. Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T. Denz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Memorandum Brief ISO MTD, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Affidavit of Selena Knox-Binion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Affidavit of Donald T. Denz, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Affidavit of Norbert A. Bennett)(Frye, William)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Arbitration Agreement 2016-07-01, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - POA, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Arbitration Agreement 2016-09-01)(Siler, Brent)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K. Van Namen on behalf of All Defendants (Van Namen, Kathryn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent E. Siler on behalf of All Defendants (Siler, Brent)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William Davis Frye on behalf of All Defendants (Frye, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to D&N, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Norbert A. Bennett. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to DTD HC, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Donald T. Denz. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Aurora Cares, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phalinda Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Correction)(Acerra, Carey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Phalinda Sykes has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: "Wet Signature". ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 failure to provie that elctronic signature will render the filing deficient.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3162097), filed by Phalinda Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Summons Aurora Cares, LLC, #2 Summons D&N, LLC, #3 Summons Donald T. Denz, #4 Summons DTD HC LLC, #5 Summons Norbert A. Bennett, #6 Summons Quince Nursing and Rehab Center, LLC, #7 Affidavit of Service, #8 Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Good Faith, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acerra, Carey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Denz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Cares, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&N, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTD HC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phalinda Sykes
Represented By: Carey Lynn Acerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?