Jenkins et al v. BWI Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Jenkins
Defendant: Chancery Clerk Chuck Thomas, Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC and BWI Companies, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02607
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Michael Myatt (Myatt, Christopher)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SETTING: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that a Status Conference has been set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 1:30 P.M. (CST) in Courtroom 1 - Memphis, before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 10/23/2019. Benjamin Lundry Daniel appeared for the plaintiff(s). Christopher Michael Myatt appeared for the defendant(s). Case Nos. 2:19cv2607, 2:19cv2633, 2:19cv2634 and 2:19cv2636 are consolidated for discovery purposes only at this time. This issue of consolidating for trial will be discussed at a later time. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Scheduling Order to be entered. A Status Conference has been set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Myatt, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Michael Myatt counsel for defendants (Myatt, Christopher)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, October 24, 2019 at 1:00 PM has been reset to Wednesday, October 23, 2019 at 11:30 A.M. (CST) in Courtroom 1- Memphis, before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, October 24, 2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Myatt, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC, BWI Companies, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3458-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3164429), filed by Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC, BWI Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit re LLC citizenship, #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Myatt, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins et al v. BWI Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancery Clerk Chuck Thomas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jenkins
Represented By: Benjamin Lundy Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?