Lovett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Lovett
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02609
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Stay until April 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/21/2019. (kah)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/08/2019. (kah)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/08/2019. (kah)
October 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3184711) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric)
October 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3184708) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/23/2019. (kah)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Alyson Kassan on behalf of Tonya Lovett (Kassan, Randi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03759. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #2 Magistrate Judicial Cards) (jae).
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3759-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13558046 filed by Tonya Lovett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Lovett
Represented By: T Matthew Leckman
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?