Blake v. Lebo
Defendant: Jonathan Lebo
Petitioner: DeAndre Blake
Case Number: 2:2019cv02620
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD AND TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/21/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DeAndre Blake. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund, #2 Envelope)(jld)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of request for payment from trust fund administrator by DeAndre Blake (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith W. Bowen on behalf of Jonathan Lebo (Bowen, Meredith)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/17/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/17/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DeAndre Blake against Jonathan Lebo. (Attachments: #1 Grounds one through six, #2 Previous Order of Dismissal case 17-2088, #3 Envelope, #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. Lebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeAndre Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lebo
Represented By: Meredith W. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?