Shaw v. H&M International Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Shaw
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and H&M International Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02629
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Notice of Services of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Allen, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by H&M International Transportation, Inc. Of Service of Its Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (McLean, Albert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Notice of Services of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Allen, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Eric Shaw Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Yasinsky, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (McLean, Albert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Allen, Craig)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 Answer to Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: "Wet Signature",ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1 Electronic Signature, the failure to provide electronic signature will render the filing deficient. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 NSRC ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Allen, Craig)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, November 20, 2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by H&M International Transportation, Inc..(McLean, Albert)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Allen on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Allen, Craig)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert G. McLean on behalf of H&M International Transportation, Inc. (McLean, Albert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Shaw as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Yasinsky, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Shaw as to H&M International Transportation, Inc.. (Yasinsky, Jason)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to H&M International Transportation, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Eric Shaw has been filed. For future reference, please note: Civil cover sheet contains wet signature. All documents submitted must contain electronic signature of attorney. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3169679), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Yasinsky, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. H&M International Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Craig Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M International Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Albert G. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Shaw
Represented By: Jason J. Yasinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?