Hall et al v. BWI Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hall and Jeri Hall
Defendant: Chancery Clerk Chuck Thomas, minor J R Priest, Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC, BWI Companies, Inc. and State Farm Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02633
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Jeri Hall, Michael Hall of First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (May, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by State Farm Insurance Company Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Spragins, Hal)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Michael Myatt (Myatt, Christopher)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 REDACTION Request for Redaction by Jeri Hall, Michael Hall. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Complaint)(May, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SETTING: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that a Status Conference has been set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 1:30 P.M. (CST) in Courtroom 1 - Memphis, before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman.(smm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 10/23/2019. Matthew Thomas May appeared for the plaintiff(s). Christopher Michael Myatt and Hal S. Spragins, Jr. appeared for the defendant(s). Case Nos. 2:19cv2607, 2:19cv2633, 2:19cv2634 and 2:19cv2636 are consolidated for discovery purposes only at this time. This issue of consolidating for trial will be discussed at a later time. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Scheduling Order to be entered. A Status Conference has been set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Myatt, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Michael Myatt counsel for defendants (Myatt, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance Company. (Spragins, Hal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Insurance Company.(Spragins, Hal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal S. Spragins, Jr on behalf of State Farm Insurance Company (Spragins, Hal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BWI Companies, Inc., Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC, Chuck Thomas.(Myatt, Christopher)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is reset for WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 23, 2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas May on behalf of Jeri Hall, Michael Hall (May, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, October 24, 2019 at 1:15 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BWI Companies, Inc., Chuck Thomas, Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3687-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3170540), filed by BWI Companies, Inc., Chuck Thomas, Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit Affidavit re LLC citizenship)(Myatt, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. BWI Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancery Clerk Chuck Thomas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: minor J R Priest
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rosenblum
Represented By: Matthew Thomas May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rosenblum
Represented By: Matthew Thomas May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?