Sam Carey Lumber Company v. Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sam Carey Lumber Company
Defendant: Jackie Rome, Brent Upshaw, Johnnie Hogan, Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC, William Hogan and Blake Ogilvie
Case Number: 2:2019cv02646
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sam Carey Lumber Company. Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Hutchens, Ricky)
November 15, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Johnnie Hogan and William Hogan's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sam Carey Lumber Company. (Hutchens, Ricky)
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sam Carey Lumber Company. (Hutchens, Ricky)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Sam Carey Lumber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hutchens, Ricky)
November 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Jackie Rome. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jackie Rome)(Collier, Danny)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Carey Lumber Company as to Blake Ogilvie. (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Carey Lumber Company as to William Hogan. (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Carey Lumber Company as to Johnnie Hogan. (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Carey Lumber Company as to Brent Upshaw. (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Carey Lumber Company as to Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/24/2019. (Parker, Thomas)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY -- NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. The new deadline to answer or otherwise respond is December 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/24/2019. (Parker, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Proposed Order Submitted by Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw. (Pesnell, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3196648) by Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, Louisiana Supreme Court and USDC Western Dist. of LA.)(Pesnell, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Johnnie Hogan and William Hogan's Motion to Dismiss by Johnnie Hogan, William Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Johnnie F. Hogan, #2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of William D. Hogan)(Collier, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/16/2019. (kah)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3192544) by Johnnie Hogan, William Hogan, Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC, Jackie Rome. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (Supreme Ct. of AL), #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (So. District of AL))(Collier, Danny)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to William Hogan. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Johnnie Hogan. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jackie Rome. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brent Upshaw. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blake Ogilvie. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/23/2019) (jld).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3172444), filed by Sam Carey Lumber Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hutchens, Ricky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sam Carey Lumber Company v. Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Rome
Represented By: Danny J. Collier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Upshaw
Represented By: William Alan Pesnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Hogan
Represented By: Danny J. Collier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC
Represented By: Danny J. Collier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hogan
Represented By: Danny J. Collier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Ogilvie
Represented By: William Alan Pesnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Carey Lumber Company
Represented By: Ricky Hutchens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?