Guthridge v. Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Guthridge
Defendant: Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02665
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.. (Tidwell, Jonathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc. (Tidwell, Jonathan)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] ORDER Granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant will have until November 11, 2019, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/21/2019. (bab)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan William Tidwell on behalf of Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc. (Tidwell, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (proposed Order submitted) by Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.. (Tidwell, Jonathan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Guthridge has been filed. For future reference, please note: Electronic signature is missing from civil cover sheet. You should resubmit using the event "attachment", linking the new signed form to the docket entry # 1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3180223), filed by Robert Guthridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthridge v. Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot House Motor Inns, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan William Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Guthridge
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?