White-Baker v. BWI Companies, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Undrea White-Baker
Defendant: Chancery Clerk Chuck Thomas, Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC and BWI Companies, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02687
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
2 Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Undrea White-Baker NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(A)(1) UPON DEFENDANTS (Skertich, Ryan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SETTING: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) The parties are hereby notified that a Status Conference has been set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 1:30 PM (CST) in Courtroom 1, Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 11/14/2019. Ryan Skertich appeared telephonically for the plaintiff. Christopher Michael Myatt appeared for the defendants. Case Nos. 2:19cv2607, 2:19cv2633, 2:19cv2634 and 2:19cv2687 are consolidated for discovery purposes only at this time. This issue of consolidating for trial will be discussed at a later time. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Scheduling Order to be entered. A Status Conference has been set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Myatt, Christopher)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference currently set for Wednesday, November 13, 2019 before Judge Mays is canceled. The Scheduling Conference will be held on Thursday, November 14, 2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/23/2019. This case is hereby transferred to Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for all further proceedings. (Mays, Samuel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Wednesday, 11/13/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Myatt, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC, Chuck Thomas, BWI Companies, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3945-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3187669), filed by Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC, Chuck Thomas, BWI Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Am Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Aff re LLC citizenship, #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Myatt, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White-Baker v. BWI Companies, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancery Clerk Chuck Thomas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Undrea White-Baker
Represented By: Ryan Skertich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?