Tennial v. REI Nation
Appellee: REI Nation
Appellant: Latasha Chanta Tennial
Not Yet Classified: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 2:2019cv02688
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Appellee's BRIEF by REI Nation. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/22/2019. (Savory, Russell)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant's Brief by Latasha Chanta Tennial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION To Reset Briefing Schedule by Latasha Chanta Tennial. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss proposed order submitted by REI Nation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BNC Certificate of Service, #2 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Savory, Russell)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019. (csf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-28470. File received, filed by Latasha Chanta Tennial. Appellant Brief due by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Order Granting Motion to Terminate Automatic Stay, or in the Alternative for an Order Deeming the Automatic Stay to Not Be In Effect as to Certain Real Property, In Rem and With Prejudice, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennial v. REI Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REI Nation
Represented By: Russell W. Savory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Latasha Chanta Tennial
Represented By: Jimmy E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?