Devoe et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Dana Dewanna Devoe and Mr. Douglas Devoe
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02699
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/6/19. (aac)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/6/19. (aac)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Douglas Devoe. (Higgins, Charles)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 12/9/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the calling instructions on the Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic conference. (jrs)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Canale on behalf of United States of America (Canale, Stuart)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America.(Martin, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United States of America. (Martin, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lester Jones, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Higgins, Charles)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Dana Dewanna Devoe, Douglas Devoe, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Dana Dewanna Devoe, Douglas Devoe has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Notice of appearance must be published by the attorney wishing to represent a party. Documents must be resubmitted and electronically signed by correct counsel. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. T(jae)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Saharovich on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saharovich, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Saharovich on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saharovich, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America (Veteran's Affair), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Dana Dewanna Devoe, Douglas Devoe has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet has a "wet" signature. All court pleadings should have an electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (agj)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Personal INjuries, Health Care Liability, Wrongful Death, and Loss of Consortium against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3190506), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Dunavant - Western District of TN, #3 Summons Barr - Department of Justice, #4 Summons Department of Veterans Affairs)(Saharovich, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devoe et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Dewanna Devoe
Represented By: Ryan Saharovich
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William Lester Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Douglas Devoe
Represented By: Ryan Saharovich
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William Lester Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart J. Canale
Represented By: Michael Jason Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?