Nelson v. Ford Motor Co.
Plaintiff: Tina Nelson
Defendant: Ford Motor Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02712
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Ford Motor Co. of a companion civil case assigned to a different judge (Bibb, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by George S Scoville, III on behalf of Ford Motor Co. (Scoville, George)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER - [NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/13/19. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Co.. (Bibb, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Co.. (Bibb, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Co. (Clark, Ryan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Randolph Bibb, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Co. (Bibb, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Ford Motor Co. on 10/24/2019, filed by Tina Nelson. (Wallis, Edwin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Co.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/22/2019) (jld).
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action ($400 fee paid; Tracking Id: ATNWDC-3196379; Approval Code: 140795) against Ford Motor Co., filed by Tina Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ford case record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Wallis, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Ford Motor Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Nelson
Represented By: Edwin E. Wallis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Co.
Represented By: George S Scoville, III
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Nelson Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?